SB1048 (CH0019)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Secure and Accessible Registration Act

Sponsored by:

Senator Smith

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {884232/145
Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted45
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable with Amendments {884232/1 Report Adopted46
Floor Amendment {433023/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted46
Floor Amendment {823027/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-31)46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/16/20183/16/2018Third Reading Passed (31-13)48
House3/16/20183/13/2018First Reading Ways and Means47
3/19/20183/19/2018Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/27/20183/20/2018Favorable Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed54
3/28/20183/21/2018Motion vote previous question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted55
Third Reading Passed (93-46)55
Senate4/7/20183/28/2018Returned Passed59
Post Passage4/5/20184/5/2018Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 7, 2018 1:07 P.M.