SB1052

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service (Grace's Law)

Sponsored by:

Senator Kittleman

Status:

In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate3/4/20133/4/2013First Reading Senate Rules
3/6/20133/7/2013Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
3/7/20133/7/2013Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/28/20133/24/2013Favorable with Amendments {508972/1 Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed with Amendments55
3/29/20133/25/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)56
House4/1/20133/26/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations59
4/5/20134/5/2013Rereferred to Judiciary
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:11 P.M.