SB1122 (CH0357)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education – Commercial Gaming Revenues – Constitutional Amendment

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 357


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/15/20182/15/2018First Reading Senate Rules
2/15/20182/16/2018Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
2/21/20182/21/2018Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20183/6/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m.
3/7/20183/7/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable with Amendments {869430/1 Report Adopted46
Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 46
3/15/20183/15/2018Floor Amendment {713425/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted47
Floor Amendment {263226/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (16-29)47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means50
3/23/20183/23/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
4/6/20184/6/2018Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/6/20183/28/2018Favorable Report Adopted62
Floor Amendment {253225/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-82)62
Second Reading Passed62
4/6/20183/29/2018Third Reading Passed (130-2)63
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 357

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:32 P.M.