SB1165 (CH0790)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student and Workforce Data Linkage - Extension of Time Limit

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 790


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate3/1/20173/1/2017First Reading Senate Rules
3/16/20173/17/2017Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/20173/17/2017Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/27/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/20173/23/2017Favorable with Amendments {134436/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/28/20173/24/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)53
House3/28/20173/23/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations57
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
4/4/20174/4/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/7/20173/31/2017Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed (96-39)66
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/27/20175/27/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 790

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 30, 2017 12:54 P.M.