SB1192

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Labor and Employment - Unemployment Insurance - Independent Contractors and Severance Pay

Sponsored by:

Senator Manno

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing canceled


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate3/15/20173/15/2017First Reading Senate Rules
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Manno) Adopted44
Referred Senate Rules44
3/16/20173/17/2017Rereferred to Finance
3/17/20173/17/2017Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20173/20/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20173/28/2017Hearing canceled

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:12 A.M.