SB1265 (CH0030)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018

Sponsored by:

Senator Klausmeier

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate3/13/20183/13/2018First Reading Senate Rules45
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Waugh) Adopted45
Referred Senate Rules45
3/16/20183/16/2018Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
3/19/20183/19/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20184/4/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
4/4/20183/30/2018Favorable with Amendments {829138/1 Report Adopted61
Floor Committee Amendment {789735/1 Adopted61
Floor Committee Amendment {939631/1 Adopted61
Floor Amendment {223621/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected (5-40)61
Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 61
4/5/20183/31/2018Floor Amendment {193529/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted62
Floor Amendment {703025/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted (25-20)62
Floor Amendment {703523/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted62
Floor Amendment {393226/1 (Senator Salling) Adopted62
Floor Amendment {503124/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted62
Floor Amendment {543527/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted62
Floor Amendment {843425/1 (Senator Madaleno) Rejected (18-26)62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted62A
Third Reading Passed (44-0)62A
House4/5/20183/27/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations61A
4/6/20184/6/2018Rereferred to Ways and Means
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20184/7/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/7/20183/30/2018Favorable with Amendments {865662/1 Report Adopted64
Floor Committee Amendment {655168/1 Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/9/20184/1/2018Floor Committee Amendment {945267/1 Adopted66
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)66
Senate4/9/20184/3/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (44-1)65
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 12:58 P.M.