HB0007 (CH0346)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Southern Maryland Higher Education Council - Modifications

Sponsored by:

Delegate Bohanan

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346


Synopsis:Increasing the number of members on the Southern Maryland Higher Education Council from 12 to 13 by adding a member of the public with extensive knowledge of higher education in Maryland, appointed by the Governor; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to provide staff for the Council; altering to December 1, 2013, the deadline for the Council to submit a final report; and extending the termination provisions relating to the Council by 1 year.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Bohanan
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Higher Education
Narrow Subject(s):Calvert County
Charles County
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Higher Education Commission
Reports
St. Mary's County
Sunset
Statutes:Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2011)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House9/27/20129/27/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Appropriations
1/16/20131/16/2013Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable Report by Appropriations
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed30
2/21/20132/21/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)32
Senate2/22/20132/22/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs31
3/6/20133/6/2013Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.