HB0016 (CH0554)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Community Colleges - Near Completers and Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships

Sponsored by:

Delegate Turner

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554


Synopsis:Requiring the Governor to include $125,000 in the State budget, in fiscal years 2020 through 2024, for the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish a near completer communication campaign; requiring the Commission to develop a web-based match program for near completers to facilitate the matching of a near completer with a certain institution; establishing a Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship program to provide tuition assistance for students to attend a community college in the State; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Turner, A. Washington, and Tarlau
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Higher Education
Narrow Subject(s):Advertising
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Community Colleges
Communications -see also- Electronic Comm; Language; Telecom
Demographics -see also- Census; Data
Electronic Communication -see also- Comm; Elec.Gov; Lang; Te
General Assembly -see also- AELR Cmte; Leg Policy Committee
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Higher Education Commission
Income Tax
Loans -see also- Mortgages
Public Information
Reimbursement Rates
Residency -see also- Immigrants and Citizenship
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Tuition
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Education
(11-209, 16-317, 16-514, 18-3401 through 18-3407)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 14, 2018 4:29 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House10/2/201710/2/2017Pre-filed
1/10/20181/10/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/9/20181/9/2018Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {985264/1 Report Adopted61A
Floor Amendment {383920/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/6/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed (92-40)62
Senate4/6/20184/1/2018First Reading Senate Rules63
4/9/20184/9/2018Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/9/20184/4/2018Favorable with Amendments {984432/1 Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed with Amendments66
4/9/20184/5/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-14)67
House4/9/20184/4/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments69
Third Reading Passed (90-48)69
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:36 P.M.