HB0133 (CH0447)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers

Sponsored by:

Dorchester County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447


Synopsis:Creating in Dorchester County a refillable container license; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license to holders of specified alcoholic beverages licenses; specifying that a holder of the refillable container license may sell draft beer for consumption off the licensed premises in a specified refillable container; prohibiting a holder of a refillable container license to display or provide shelving for beer for off-premises consumption; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Dorchester County Delegation
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0150
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Advertising
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Beverage Containers
Dorchester County
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Hearings
Labeling
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Statutes:Article - Alcoholic Beverages
(8-210)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/17/20131/17/2013First Reading Economic Matters
1/22/20131/22/2013Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20133/7/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/8/20133/8/2013Favorable Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed43
3/12/20133/12/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)45
Senate3/13/20133/13/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs44
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.