HB0464 (CH0245)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales

Sponsored by:

Delegate Beitzel

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245


Synopsis:Specifying that provisions of law concerning the Sunday sale of alcoholic beverages in Garrett County apply to a precinct of an election district in which the voters in a referendum authorized by law approve Sunday sales; specifying that provisions of law concerning Sunday sales apply to a holder of a Class D license operating an establishment that meets four specifications; and providing for specified fees.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Beitzel
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0371
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Blue Laws
Elections -see also- Ballots; Camp Financ; Pol Cands; Voting
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Garrett County
Referendum
Restaurants
Statutes:Article - Alcoholic Beverages
(11-512)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Economic Matters
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20133/7/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/8/20133/8/2013Favorable Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed43
3/12/20133/12/2013Third Reading Passed (130-1)45
Senate3/13/20133/13/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs44
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.