HB0644 (CH0507)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax - Electronic Filing - Designation to Purchase Federal Savings Bonds

Sponsored by:

Delegate Olszewski

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507


Synopsis:Allowing an individual who files an income tax return electronically to elect to use all or a portion of the individual's income tax refund to purchase U.S. Series I Savings Bonds; specifying that the individual must make the designation in $50 increments; requiring the Comptroller to send any remaining portion of the individual's refund to the individual; requiring the Comptroller to adopt specified regulations; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Olszewski, Afzali, Barve, Branch, Cardin, Dwyer, Frick, George, Harper, Hixson, Howard, Ivey, Kaiser, Luedtke, A. Miller, Myers, Serafini, Stukes, Summers, F. Turner, Walker, and A. Washington
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0613
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Bonds -see also- County & Baltimore City Bonds; State Bonds
Comptroller
Electronic Government
Income Tax
Rules and Regulations
Statutes:Article - Tax - General
(10-804)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {165369/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/21/20133/18/2013Third Reading Passed (137-1)51
Senate3/22/20133/20/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation51
3/27/20133/27/2013Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/4/20133/30/2013Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/5/20133/31/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)62
House4/5/20133/31/2013Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.