HB0960 (CH0439)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Guardians of Property and Custodians - Authority to Fund Certain Trusts and Accounts

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kelly

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439


Synopsis:Authorizing a guardian of the property of a specified minor or disabled person to pay or apply income or principal from a specified estate to establish or fund a specified special needs trust, a pooled asset special needs trust account, or an Achieving a Better Life Experience account for the benefit of the minor or disabled person, without court authorization or confirmation; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Kelly, Cullison, West, Hammen, Pendergrass, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Hill, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Rose, Sample-Hughes, and K. Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0853
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Estates and Trusts
Narrow Subject(s):Assisted Living -see also- Group Homes
Attorney General
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Estates and Trusts
Group Homes -see also- Assisted Living
Guardians
Health -see also- Mental Health
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Personal Property
Real Property
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
Statutes:Article - Estates and Trusts
(13-101, 13-214, 13-314)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:03 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20162/10/2016First Reading Health and Government Operations
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20163/15/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/16/20163/13/2016Favorable with Amendments {116385/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/17/20163/15/2016Third Reading Passed (138-0)47
Senate3/18/20163/18/2016First Reading Judicial Proceedings47
4/4/20164/4/2016Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/1/20163/28/2016Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/4/20163/29/2016Third Reading Passed (45-0)58
House4/5/20163/29/2016Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/10/20165/10/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:03 P.M.