HB1209 (CH0502)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Safety – Missing Persons – Information (Eula and Danny’s Law)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Proctor

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502


Synopsis:Requiring a law enforcement agency, with regard to a missing person, to enter all necessary and available information into the National Crime Information Center computer network within 2 hours after receipt of the minimum information necessary to make the entry; and requiring the Department of State Police to place a direct link to the Internet site of the Maryland Center for Missing and Unidentified Persons on the home page of the Department's website.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Proctor, Pena-Melnyk, Atterbeary, Barron, Dumais, Fennell, Frush, Gibson, Healey, C. Howard, Jameson, Lam, J. Lewis, Patterson, Pendergrass, Queen, Sample-Hughes, Sydnor, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, A. Washington, and Wilkins
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Elderly Persons -see also- Vulnerable Adults
Electronic Government -see also- Electronic Communication
Pedestrians
State Police, Department of
Statutes:Article - Public Safety
(3-601, 3-607)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 4:25 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20182/8/2018First Reading Judiciary
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20183/17/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/17/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {512815/1 Report Adopted47A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47A
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48B
3/20/20183/20/2018Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20184/9/2018Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/9/20184/5/2018Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted67
Third Reading Passed (46-0)67
House4/10/20184/5/2018Returned Passed70
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:34 P.M.