HB1387 (CH0591)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Banquet Facility License

Sponsored by:

Frederick County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 591


Synopsis:Altering the Banquet Facility license in Frederick County by specifying that a requirement concerning minimum serving capacity may be met by persons who are inside the facility or outside on the premises; repealing the requirement that a facility be eligible for inclusion in a specified national register; making $250,000 the minimum capital investment requirement for licensees; and authorizing a licensee to sell alcoholic beverages for off-premises consumption in collectible bottles.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Frederick County Delegation
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0957
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Beverage Containers
Food -see also- Kosher; Meat, Poultry, Seafood; Milk
Frederick County
Historical Matters
Investments -see also- Securities
Registration -see also- Motor Vehicle Registration
Statutes:Article - Alcoholic Beverages
(6-201)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/14/20132/14/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/5/20133/6/2013Rereferred to Economic Matters
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/6/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (126-0)65
Senate4/8/20134/2/2013First Reading Senate Rules64
4/8/20134/8/2013Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/8/20134/5/2013Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67
4/8/20134/6/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)68
House4/8/20134/5/2013Returned Passed69
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 591

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:06 P.M.