HB1514 (CH0421)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Howard County - Noise Control - Outdoor Concert Venues Ho. Co. 9-13

Sponsored by:

Howard County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421


Synopsis:Prohibiting the Department of the Environment from adopting a noise control ordinance, rule, or regulation regarding an outdoor concert venue with a capacity over 15,000 individuals in Howard County, as specified; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Howard County Delegation
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Environmental Matters  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Counties - Local Laws
Narrow Subject(s):Art, Music and Cultural Affairs -see also- Musms; Theat; etc
Environment, Department of
Howard County
Laws and Ordinances -see also- Pub Local Laws; Uniform Laws
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Noise
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Statutes:Article - Environment
(3-105, 3-401)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House3/4/20133/4/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/12/20133/13/2013Rereferred to Environmental Matters
3/15/20133/15/2013Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20133/23/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/23/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments {620812/1 Report Adopted53
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (132-4)54
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.