SB0517 (CH0004)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana and Drug Paraphernalia

Sponsored by:

Senator Zirkin

Status:

Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 4 of 2016


Synopsis:Establishing a civil penalty for the smoking of marijuana in a public place; establishing that a specified criminal prohibition on the use or possession of drug paraphernalia does not apply to the use or possession of drug paraphernalia involving the use or possession of marijuana; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Zirkin
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): February 20, 2016
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  View Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Criminal Law - Procedure
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Narrow Subject(s):Citations
Controlled Dangerous Substances -see also- Drugs; Subst Abus
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Drugs -see also- Controlled Dangerous Sub; Substance Abuse
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Health -see also- Mental Health
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Negligence -see also- Medical Malpractice
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Public Buildings and Facilities -see also- Stadiums; St Hse
Smoking -see also- Cigarettes
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(5-601, 5-619)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 16, 2016 8:24 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/6/20152/6/2015First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/10/20152/10/2015Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20153/16/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/17/20153/17/2015Favorable with Amendments {178278/244
Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted44
3/18/20153/18/2015Favorable with Amendments {178278/2 Report Adopted45
Floor Committee Amendment {318871/1 Adopted45
Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {973126/1 Rejected (8-38)45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/20/20153/20/2015Third Reading Passed (32-13)47
House3/20/20153/18/2015First Reading Judiciary48
3/20/20153/20/2015Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20154/10/2015Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/10/20154/5/2015Favorable Report Adopted66
Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) {473927/166
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted (86-50)66
Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) Rejected (57-78)66
Second Reading Passed66
4/11/20154/6/2015Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) {533827/167
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted67
Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (63-73)67
Third Reading Passed (83-53)67
Senate4/13/20154/5/2015Returned Passed63
Post Passage5/22/20155/22/2015Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Senate1/13/20161/13/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
1/21/20161/21/2016Veto overridden (29-17)
House1/21/20161/21/2016Veto overridden (86-55)
Post Passage1/21/20161/21/2016Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 4 of 2016

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 16, 2016 8:24 A.M.