SB0542 (CH0498)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Election Law - Polling Places - Electioneering

Sponsored by:

Senator Young

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 498


Synopsis:Requiring that electioneering be allowed on the premises of a public building that is used for a polling place up to a specified electioneering boundary; requiring that campaign signs be allowed on the premises of a public building that is used for a polling place for, at a minimum, specified time periods; prohibiting a polling place from being located in a privately owned building except under specified circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Young, Jacobs, Raskin, and Shank
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0730
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  Listen to Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Elections
Narrow Subject(s):Boundaries
Elections -see also- Ballots; Camp Financ; Pol Cands; Voting
Public Buildings and Facilities -see also- Stadiums; St Hse
Signs and Billboards
Statutes:Article - Election Law
(10-101)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20133/7/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable with Amendments {184735/1 Report Adopted42
Second Reading Passed with Amendments42
3/13/20133/13/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)44
House3/13/20133/13/2013First Reading Ways and Means46
3/20/20133/20/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/3/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {105068/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/4/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)62
Senate4/5/20133/31/2013Senate Concur - House Amendment62
Third Reading Passed (46-0)62
Passed Enrolled62
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 498

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.