HB0001

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Cannabimimetic Agents - Prohibition

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kelly, K.

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Listing cannabimimetic agents on Schedule I for purposes of designating controlled dangerous substances that may not be legally used, possessed, or distributed; and defining cannabimimetic agents.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates K. Kelly, Dumais, Simmons, Sophocleus, Vitale, Eckardt, Clagett, Hogan, Burns, Dwyer, George, Kipke, McConkey, Minnick, Stocksdale, Valentino-Smith, Wood, Afzali, Aumann, Beidle, Costa, Frank, Krebs, W. Miller, Wilson, Elliott, Hough, and Schulz
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Controlled Dangerous Substances -see also- Drugs; Subst Abus
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(5-101, 5-402)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House9/4/20129/4/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/2/20131/2/2013Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {432312/1 Report Adopted30
Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate Vitale) Adopted 30
2/20/20132/20/2013Floor Amendment (Delegate Vitale) {633626/131
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted31
Floor Amendment (Delegate Vitale) Rejected (60-76)31
Second Reading Passed with Amendments31
2/22/20132/22/2013Third Reading Passed (132-0)33
Senate2/25/20132/25/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings32
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.