HB0001

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Clippinger

Status:

In the House - Passed Enrolled


Synopsis:Requiring employers with 15 or more employees to provide employees with earned sick and safe leave that is paid at the same wage rate as the employee normally earns; requiring employers with 14 or fewer employees to provide unpaid earned sick and safe leave; prohibiting an employer from being required to pay a tipped employee more than a minimum wage for earned sick and safe leave; requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to develop a specified model paid sick and safe leave policy for use by specified employers; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Clippinger, Davis, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Branch, Brooks, Carr, Chang, Conaway, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Knotts, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Vallario, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0230
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0580 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Private Sector Labor and Industry
State Government - Personnel
Narrow Subject(s):Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Hearings
Inspections -see also- Motor Vehicle Inspection
Investigations and Inquiries -see also- Crim Bckgrnd Invest
Leave
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Privacy
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Safety -see also- Cybersecurity; Occupational Safety
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Time
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Labor and Employment
(2-106, 3-103, 3-1301 through 3-1311)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2017 11:59 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House9/29/20169/29/2016Pre-filed
1/11/20171/11/2017First Reading Economic Matters
1/25/20171/25/2017Hearing 2/10 at 12:30 p.m.
2/27/20172/27/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Favorable with Amendments {323090/1 Report Adopted34
Special Order until 3/1 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 34
3/1/20173/1/2017Floor Amendment {873520/1 (Delegate Cluster) Rejected (53-85)36
Floor Amendment {343529/1 (Delegate Afzali) Rejected (50-88)36
Floor Amendment {303922/1 (Delegate Afzali) Rejected (52-87)36
Floor Amendment {973927/1 (Delegate McKay) Rejected (51-88)36
Floor Amendment {143223/1 (Delegate Carozza) Rejected (53-84)36
Floor Amendment {373125/1 (Delegate Jacobs) Rejected (50-86)36
Floor Amendment {543829/1 (Delegate Malone) Rejected (48-89)36
Floor Amendment {103227/1 (Delegate Flanagan)36
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted36
Floor Amendment (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (48-89)36
Floor Amendment {953926/1 (Delegate McMillan) Rejected36
Second Reading Passed with Amendments36
3/3/20173/3/2017Third Reading Passed (88-51)38
Senate3/6/20173/6/2017First Reading Finance37
3/14/20173/14/2017Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/31/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments {707175/1 Report Adopted56
Floor Amendment {673625/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted56
Second Reading Passed with Amendments56
4/3/20173/28/2017Floor Committee Amendment {717671/1 Adopted57
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (29-18)57
House4/5/20173/29/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments63
Third Reading Passed (87-53)63
Passed Enrolled

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:10 A.M.