HB0002 (CH0598)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Glenn

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 598


Synopsis:Altering the definition of "grower" to mean an entity that cultivates or packages medical cannabis and is authorized to provide cannabis to certain entities; establishing a Compassionate Use Fund to provide access to medical cannabis for certain individuals; altering the number of medical cannabis growers that may be licensed; requiring the Commission to report to the General Assembly beginning December 1, 2024, on the number of licenses necessary to meet the demand for medical cannabis by certain qualifying patients; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Glenn
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0001
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Auditors and Audits
Cannabis -see also- Smoking
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Electronic Government -see also- Electronic Communication
Emergency Bills
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
General Assembly -see also- AELR Cmte; Leg Policy Committee
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Industry and Technology
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Minorities -see also- Women
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Reports
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Rules and Regulations
Women -see also- Gender
Statutes:Article - Health - General
(13-3301, 13-3302, 13-3303, 13-3305, 13-3306, 13-3307, 13-3308, 13-3309, 13-3310, 13-3316, 13-3301.1, 13-3303.1, 13-3305.1, 13-3305.2, 13-3305.3, 13-3311.1)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(6-226)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 18, 2018 4:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House9/25/20179/25/2017Pre-filed
1/10/20181/10/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/3/20181/3/2018Hearing 1/15 at 2:00 p.m.
3/2/20183/2/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Favorable with Amendments {326889/1 Report Adopted38
Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted 38
3/6/20183/6/2018Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (121-16)42
Senate3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Finance43
3/13/20183/13/2018Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/2/20183/28/2018Favorable with Amendments {517177/3 Report Adopted59
Floor Amendment {743822/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted59
Floor Amendment {793121/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/3/20183/29/2018Floor Amendment {983125/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (23-23)60
Floor Amendment {183927/1 (Senator Muse) Withdrawn60
Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted 60
Floor Amendment {183927/2 (Senator Muse) Adopted60
Floor Amendment {923424/1 (Senator Ready)60
Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Feldman) Adopted 60
4/4/20183/30/2018Floor Amendment {923424/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted (29-16)61
Motion Reconsider Floor Amendment {183927/2 (Senator Muse) (Senator Feldman) Adopted61
Floor Amendment {183927/2 (Senator Muse) Withdrawn61
Floor Amendment {473326/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted (38-7)61
Floor Amendment {433229/1 (Senator Zirkin)61
Floor Amendment {153322/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted (42-3)61
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-3)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments61
House Requests Senate Recede61
Conference Committee Appointed61
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, and Kipke61
Senate4/5/20183/31/2018Senate Refuses to Recede62A
Conference Committee Appointed62A
Senators Feldman, Benson, and Reilly62A
House4/7/20183/31/2018Conference Committee Report Adopted65
Third Reading Passed (118-15)65
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Conference Committee Report Adopted64
Third Reading Passed (40-5)64
House4/9/20183/31/2018Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 598

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:16 P.M.