HB0007

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation - Feed the Hungry Organizations

Sponsored by:

Delegate Mautz

Status:

In the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Allowing an individual to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain qualified expenses if the individual harvests an antlerless deer and donates the deer meat to certain organizations; requiring the Comptroller to report to the General Assembly on the effectiveness of the tax credit, including the number of deer donated under the program and the total cost of the tax credit; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017, but before January 1, 2023; and terminating the Act after June 30, 2023; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Mautz, Beitzel, and Carey
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0182
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Comptroller
Food -see also- Kosher; Meat, Poultry, Seafood; Milk
Hunting -see also- Trapping
Income Tax
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Sunset
Tax Credits
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(5-634)
Article - Tax - General
(10-746)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 17, 2018 4:06 P.M.