HB0008

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and Limits

Sponsored by:

Delegate Vitale

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Authorizing a guardian of the property of a minor or disabled person to petition the court to deposit cash belonging to the minor or disabled person in an amount not exceeding $200,000 into a single restricted account; requiring specified excess amounts to be deposited into additional restricted accounts not exceeding $200,000; and authorizing a deposit under the Act to be made into any type of account, including a certificate of deposit, in a specified financial institution or one that accepts deposits and is federally insured.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Vitale
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0168
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Estates and Trusts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Narrow Subject(s):Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Estates and Trusts
Guardians
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Orphans' Court
Petitions
Statutes:Article - Estates and Trusts
(13-209.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House11/1/201211/1/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/2/20131/2/2013Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {222518/1 Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed with Amendments30
2/21/20132/21/2013Third Reading Passed (133-0)32
Senate2/22/20132/22/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings31
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.