HB0009 (CH0252)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health - Food Allergy Awareness, Food Safety, and Food Service Facility Letter Grading - Posting Requirement and Task Force

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hixson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252


Synopsis:Requiring a food establishment, beginning March 1, 2014, to display a specified poster relating to food allergies; requiring, on or before January 1, 2014, the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with the Restaurant Association of Maryland and Food Allergy Research and Education, to create and make available on its Web site a specified poster; establishing a Task Force to Study Food Allergy Awareness, Food Safety, and Food Service Facility Letter Grading; requiring a report on or before January 1, 2014; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Hixson, Valderrama, Howard, and Simmons
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0390
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013, October 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingFinance  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Disclosure
Diseases -see also- AIDS; Rabies
Electronic Government
Food -see also- Kosher; Meat, Poultry, Seafood; Milk
Governor
Health -see also- Mental Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Holidays and Special Dates
Inspections -see also- Motor Vehicle Inspection
Job Training
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Notices
Reports
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
Signs and Billboards
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Health - General
(21-330.2)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.