HB0014

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Part-Time School Employees, Contractors, and Coaches - Sexual Contact with Minors

Sponsored by:

Delegate Clippinger

Status:

In the House - Conference Committee Appointed


Synopsis:Altering the definition of a "person in a position of authority" prohibited from engaging in a sexual act, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a specified person under a specified age under specified circumstances to include any employee, contractor, subcontractors or contractors' employees, including a part-time employee or coach of a specified age who exercises supervision of the person.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Clippinger, K. Kelly, Simmons, Arora, Dumais, Glenn, Anderson, Lee, McComas, Mitchell, Sophocleus, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, and Waldstreicher
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Contractors -see also- Heating & Cooling; Home Improvement
Counselors -see also- Social Workers
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Private Schools
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Schools
Sexual Offenses
Sports and Recreation
Students
Teachers
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(3-307, 3-308)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House9/17/20129/17/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/2/20131/2/2013Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/21/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments {922319/1 Report Adopted51
Special Order until later today (Delegate Olszewski) Adopted 51
Special Order until 3/22 (Delegate Olszewski) Adopted 51
3/23/20133/20/2013Floor Committee Amendment {412711/1 Adopted53
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)54
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments {518273/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-2)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments67
House Requests Senate Recede67
Conference Committee Appointed67
Delegates Simmons, Mitchell, and Hough67

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.