HB0016

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations

Sponsored by:

Delegate Arora

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


Synopsis:Altering the effective date of specified regulations adopted under the Administrative Procedure Act.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Arora, Kipke, Bromwell, Krebs, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Ready, and Tarrant
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0261
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Administrative Procedure Act
Environmental Health -see also- Pollution
Federal Government
Health -see also- Mental Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Maryland Register
Medical Assistance
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
Statutes:Article - State Government
(10-117)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House9/26/20129/26/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/6/20133/6/2013Favorable with Amendments {396280/1 Report Adopted41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/8/20133/8/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)43
Senate3/11/20133/11/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs42

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.