HB0025

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting

Sponsored by:

Delegate George

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Prohibiting a municipality from requiring an individual to provide a reason that the individual will be unable to vote in person on election day in order to vote by absentee ballot.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate George
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Ways and Means   View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Municipal Corporations
Elections
Narrow Subject(s):Ballots
Elections -see also- Ballots; Camp Financ; Pol Cands; Voting
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Voting -see also- Ballots; Elections
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:47 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House11/13/201311/13/2013Pre-filed
1/8/20141/8/2014First Reading Ways and Means
1/21/20141/21/2014Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2/24/20142/24/2014Favorable Report by Ways and Means
2/25/20142/25/2014Favorable Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed35
2/27/20142/27/2014Third Reading Passed (127-0)37
Senate2/28/20142/28/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs36
3/5/20143/5/2014Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:47 P.M.