HB0032

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Drunk Driving - Transporting Minor - Ignition Interlock System Program

Sponsored by:

Delegate Arora

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary


Synopsis:Requiring individuals who are convicted of specified alcohol-related driving offenses involving transportation of a minor to successfully complete the Ignition Interlock System Program.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Arora
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Narrow Subject(s):Drunk and Drugged Driving
Ex-Offenders
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Statutes:Article - Transportation
(16-404.1, 21-902)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House9/4/20129/4/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/2/20131/2/2013Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Unfavorable Report by Judiciary

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.