HB0035

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Wearing, Carrying, or Transporting a Handgun - Active Assignment Exception

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kelly, K.

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Modifying an exception to the prohibition against wearing, carrying, or transporting handguns that limits the exception to a specified person on active assignment engaged in law enforcement.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate K. Kelly
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Armed Forces -see also- Militia; Veterans
Correctional Officers
Guns
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Sheriffs
Weapons -see also- Guns
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(4-203)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House10/22/201210/22/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Judiciary
2/8/20132/8/2013Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20133/23/2013Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.