HB0040

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption

Sponsored by:

Delegate Morgan

Status:

In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Exempting from the St. Mary's County property tax specified personal property purchased by businesses for personal property tax returns filed during the period from January 1, 2017, to December 31, 2018; exempting specified personal property from the St. Mary's County property tax for personal property tax returns filed on or after January 1, 2019; providing that specified personal property remains subject to the St. Mary's County property tax; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Morgan
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0184 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Property - Local
Narrow Subject(s):Cable Television
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Exemptions
Local Government Mandates
Personal Property
Property Tax
Railroads
Reports
St. Mary's County
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Utilities -see also- High Voltage Lines; Telephones; Water
Statutes:Article - Tax - Property
(7-402)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:56 P.M.