HB0043

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax Credit for Qualifying Employees - Sunset Repeal

Sponsored by:

Delegate Glass

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Repealing termination provisions and altering dates of applicability for specified tax credits for employers that hire qualifying individuals with disabilities; and declaring that it is the intent of the General Assembly that the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, the Department of Disabilities, and the Department of Veterans Affairs make every effort to promote and market the Qualifying Employees with Disabilities Tax Credit to Maryland employers; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Glass
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0124
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Corporations -see also- Municipal Corps; Public Corps & Inst
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Income Tax
Sunset
Tax Credits -see also- Circuit Breaker
Veterans
Statutes:Article - Chapter of the Acts
(1997, 1998, 2000, 2003, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House10/31/201210/31/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Ways and Means
1/14/20131/14/2013Hearing 1/23 at 11:00 a.m.
4/6/20134/6/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/6/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments {735264/1 Report Adopted65
Floor Committee Amendment {555866/1 Adopted65
Second Reading Passed with Amendments65
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)66
Senate4/8/20134/3/2013First Reading Senate Rules65
4/8/20134/8/2013Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/8/20134/5/2013Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67
4/8/20134/6/2013Third Reading Passed (45-0)68
House4/8/20134/5/2013Returned Passed69
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.