HB0043

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings

Sponsored by:

Delegate Conaway

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary


Synopsis:Creating an exception to the general prohibition against recording or broadcasting a criminal sentencing hearing; establishing requirements that a media organization file a specified written request to provide media coverage of a criminal sentencing hearing with the clerk of the court at least 24 hours before the hearing is scheduled to begin; requiring the clerk of the court to provide notice of the request to each party involved in the criminal proceeding; providing specified factors that a presiding judge may consider; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Conaway
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0081 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Procedure
Narrow Subject(s):Clerks of Court
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Judges
News Media
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Recordings -see also- Video
Statutes:Article - Criminal Procedure
(1-201)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:58 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House6/24/20166/24/2016Pre-filed
1/11/20171/11/2017First Reading Judiciary
1/4/20171/4/2017Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2/27/20172/27/2017Unfavorable Report by Judiciary

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:58 P.M.