HB0060

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Conduct (Lynette's Law)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Smigiel

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Prohibiting a specified professional counselor or therapist from engaging in a sexual act, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a person who is receiving counseling from the professional counselor or therapist or received counseling from the professional counselor or therapist within a specified period of time; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Smigiel and Dumais
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Counselors -see also- Social Workers
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Criminal Background Investigations
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Marriage
Mental Health
Patients
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Sexual Offenses
Substance Abuse
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(5-106)
Article - Criminal Law
(3-307, 3-308)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House11/15/201211/15/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/16/20131/16/2013Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing cancelled
Rereferred to Judiciary
1/24/20131/24/2013Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments {462511/1 Report Adopted40
Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 40
3/7/20133/7/2013Floor Committee Amendment {732419/1 Adopted42
Second Reading Passed with Amendments42
3/12/20133/12/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)45
Senate3/13/20133/13/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings44
3/22/20133/22/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.