HB0066 (CH0088)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - Repeal

Sponsored by:

Chair, Appropriations Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88


Synopsis:Repealing the Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program, which authorizes the Board of Public Works, on the recommendation of the Executive Director of the Governor's Office for Children, to make specified grants to counties, municipal corporations, and nonprofit organizations; repealing provisions of law relating to the purposes, administration, and funding of the Program; repealing provisions of law relating to the uses, terms, and conditions of the grants and the State's recovery of funds expended under the Program; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Office for Children)
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Children
Narrow Subject(s):Attorneys' Fees
Child Care
Children, Governor's Office for
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Construction
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Court Costs
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Grants
Judgments
Land Records -see also- Deeds
Liens -see also- Mechanics' Liens
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Public Buildings and Facilities -see also- Stadiums; St Hse
Public Works, Board of
Religion -see also- Churches
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Human Services
(8-901 through 8-911)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:57 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House9/24/20159/24/2015Pre-filed
1/13/20161/13/2016First Reading Appropriations
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
1/21/20161/21/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 1/26 at 3:30 p.m.
3/3/20163/3/2016Favorable Report by Appropriations
3/4/20163/4/2016Favorable Report Adopted38
Second Reading Passed38
3/8/20163/8/2016Third Reading Passed (139-0)40
Senate3/9/20163/9/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation40
3/16/20163/16/2016Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20164/5/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/5/20163/30/2016Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/6/20163/31/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)60
House4/7/20163/31/2016Returned Passed63
Post Passage4/12/20164/12/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:57 P.M.