HB0070 (CH0459)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Government - Access to Public Records in Electronic Formats - Termination Date

Sponsored by:

Delegate Carr

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459


Synopsis:Repealing the termination date for provisions of law related to access to public records in specified electronic formats.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Carr
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0342
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Electronic Government
Public Information
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Sunset
Statutes:Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2011)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/11/20131/11/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2/20/20132/20/2013Favorable with Amendments {736289/1 Report Adopted31
Second Reading Passed with Amendments31
2/22/20132/22/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)33
Senate2/25/20132/25/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs32
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.