HB0074

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License Holder

Sponsored by:

Senator Feldman

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


Synopsis:Allowing an individual in a restaurant, club, or hotel for which any license allowing the sale of wine is issued to consume wine not purchased from or provided by the license holder under specified circumstances, including a requirement that the license holder obtain a corkage permit; and requiring each local licensing board to issue a corkage permit at no charge.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Feldman
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0260
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages -see also- AB-By Subd; Subst Abuse; etc.
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Hotels and Motels
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Restaurants
Statutes:Article - Alcoholic Beverages
(12-107)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/11/20131/11/2013First Reading Economic Matters
1/16/20131/16/2013Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20133/14/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/18/20133/15/2013Favorable with Amendments {473892/1 Report Adopted48A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48A
3/19/20133/16/2013Third Reading Passed (136-0)49
Senate3/20/20133/18/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs49
4/8/20134/8/2013Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.