HB0078

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption

Sponsored by:

Delegate Simmons

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings


Synopsis:Establishing that, in an action against an owner of a dog for damages for personal injury or death caused by the dog, evidence that the dog caused the injury or death creates a rebuttable presumption that the owner knew or should have known that the dog had vicious or dangerous propensities; establishing that in an action against a person other than an owner of a dog for specified damages, the common law prior to April 1, 2012, is retained as to the person without regard to the breed or heritage of the dog; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Simmons, Anderson, Bromwell, Cardin, K. Kelly, Kramer, Smigiel, and Vallario
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0160
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Civil Actions and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Animals -see also- Birds; Turtles
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Condominiums
Corporations -see also- Municipal Corps; Public Corps & Inst
Court of Appeals
Damages
Death -see also- Advance Medical Directives; Wrongful Death
Emergency Bills
Evidence
Homeowners Associations
Housing -see also- Apartments; Condos; Mobile & Manuf Homes
Landlord and Tenant -see also- Eviction; Leases & Rent; etc.
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(3-1901)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/14/20131/14/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/16/20131/16/2013Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
1/18/20131/18/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {792616/1 Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed with Amendments30
2/21/20132/21/2013Third Reading Passed (133-0)32
Senate2/22/20132/22/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings31

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.