HB0083

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Increasing the number of judges of the Court of Special Appeals from 13 to 15; increasing the number of resident judges of the circuit court in Calvert, Carroll, Cecil, Frederick, and Wicomico counties; and increasing the number of associate judges of the District Court in Baltimore City, and Charles, Montgomery, and Prince George's counties.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:The Speaker (By Request - Maryland Judiciary)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0239
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Narrow Subject(s):Baltimore City
Calvert County
Carroll County
Cecil County
Charles County
Circuit Courts
Court of Special Appeals
District Courts
Frederick County
Judges
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Wicomico County
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(1-402, 1-503, 1-603)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/14/20131/14/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25/20132/25/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
2/26/20132/26/2013Favorable Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed35
2/28/20132/28/2013Third Reading Passed (127-6)37
Senate2/28/20132/28/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation35
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)61
House4/4/20133/29/2013Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.