HB0084

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Health - Child Care Products Containing Flame-Retardant Chemicals - Prohibition

Sponsored by:

Delegate Angel

Status:

In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from importing, selling, or offering for sale certain child care products containing one-tenth of 1% of certain flame-retardant chemicals and intended for use by a child under the age of 12 years; authorizing the Secretary of Health to suspend implementation of certain provisions of the Act if the Secretary makes a certain determination; altering the date by which the Maryland Department of Health is required to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Angel
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Child Care
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Fire Protection
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Health, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Cybersecurity; Occupational Safety
Statutes:Article - Health - General
(24-306)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 14, 2018 10:25 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/12/20181/12/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
1/17/20181/17/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
1/24/20181/24/2018Hearing canceled
1/25/20181/25/2018Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 25, 2018 1:01 P.M.