HB0101 (CH0424)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, and 2012

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424


Synopsis:Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $1,109,119,000, the proceeds to be used for specified necessary building, construction, demolition, planning, renovation, conversion, replacement, and capital equipment purchases of the State, for acquiring specified real estate in connection therewith, and for grants to specified subdivisions and other organizations for specified development and improvement purposes, subject to specified requirements; etc.
Analysis:Not available at this time
All Sponsors:The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0126
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013, June 1, 2014, June 1, 2015, June 1, 2016, June 1, 2017, June 1, 2018, June 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
AppropriationsBudget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Capital Budget
Narrow Subject(s):Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Capital Budgets
State Bonds
Statutes:Article - Economic Development
(10-640, 10-641, 10-642, 10-643, 10-644)
Article - Education
(5-301)
Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 29, 2013 9:14 P.M.