HB0102 (CH0425)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425


Synopsis:Altering the frequency with which specified payments from a special fund are required to be paid; requiring the reduction of specified grants and payments under specified circumstances; providing that a specified District Court surcharge shall be added to fines imposed for specified traffic cases and not to court costs; providing that specified regulations and licensing requirements of the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission supersede specified county fees or regulations and licensing requirements; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0127
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013, July 1, 2013, September 1, 2013, October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Operating Budget
Narrow Subject(s):Abandoned Property
Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Admissions and Amusement Tax
Appropriations
Arrests
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs -see also- Musms; Theat; etc
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Campaign Financing
Child Care
Citations
Coal
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Comptroller
Corporations -see also- Municipal Corps; Public Corps & Inst
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
District Courts
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Electronic Government
Environment, Department of
Environmental Health -see also- Pollution
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Forms
Fuel -see also- Coal
Gaming -see also- Bingo; Lottery; Raffles
General Services, Department of
Grants
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Historical Matters
Hospitals -see also- Clinics; State Hospitals
Income Tax
Insurance -see also- Health Ins; MAIF; Motor Vehicle Ins
Interest
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Leases and Rent
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Lottery
Medical Assistance
Minorities -see also- Women
Motor Vehicle Registration
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Natural Resources, Department of
News Media
Notaries Public
Notices
Planning, Department of
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Private Schools
Property Tax
Public Information
Public Schools
Racing
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Rules and Regulations
Salaries -see also- Overtime; Reimbursement Rates
Small Business
Special Education
State Aid
State Employees
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Tax Credits -see also- Circuit Breaker
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation, Department of
Utilities -see also- High Voltage Lines; Telephones; Water
Veterans
Women
Statutes:Article - Business Regulation
(11-404, 11-404.1)
Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(7-301)
Article - Criminal Law
(12-301.1)
Article - Education
(22-306.1, 5-202)
Article - Local Government
(16-501)
Article - Natural Resources
(5-903)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(3A-302)
Article - State Government
(18-103, 18-112, 9-112)
Article - Tax - General
(10-733, 2-606)
Article - Tax - Property
(13-209)
Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2004, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 29, 2013 9:14 P.M.