HB0116 (CH0039)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid Fraud

Sponsored by:

Delegate Mitchell

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39


Synopsis:Adding abuse or neglect of a vulnerable adult and offenses relating to Medicaid fraud to those crimes for which specified evidence may be gathered by, and a judge may grant an order authorizing, interception of oral, wire, or electronic communications.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Mitchell, Clippinger, Cluster, Conaway, Cullison, Gutierrez, Haynes, McDermott, Oaks, B. Robinson, and Rosenberg
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0267
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Communications -see also- Language; Telecommun & Info Tech
Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect
Elderly Persons
Electronic Surveillance -see also- Wiretapping
Evidence
Fraud -see also- Forgery
Investigations and Inquiries -see also- Crim Bckgrnd Invest
Judges
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Medical Assistance
Wiretapping
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(10-402, 10-406)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/16/20131/16/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2/11/20132/11/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
2/12/20132/12/2013Favorable Report Adopted25
Second Reading Passed25
2/14/20132/14/2013Third Reading Passed (139-0)27
Senate2/15/20132/15/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings26
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.