HB0128 (CH0026)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Homestead Tax Credit - Eligibility Verification and Application

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, M.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26


Synopsis:Altering the dates by which specified applications for the homestead property tax credit for specified dwellings are required to be filed with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; altering the taxable years in which the tax credit may not be granted for specified dwellings under specified circumstances; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates M. Washington, Anderson, Beidle, Braveboy, Gaines, Lafferty, Luedtke, McDermott, McIntosh, Mitchell, Mizeur, B. Robinson, Rudolph, Stukes, Summers, Tarrant, A. Washington, Frick, McMillan, A. Miller, Hixson, F. Turner, Afzali, Barve, Boteler, Branch, Cardin, Fisher, George, Harper, Howard, Ivey, Kaiser, Myers, Serafini, and Walker
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0158
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Property
Narrow Subject(s):Emergency Bills
Housing -see also- Apartments; Condos; Mobile & Manuf Homes
Property Tax
Real Property
Tax Credits -see also- Circuit Breaker
Statutes:Article - Tax - Property
(9-105)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/17/20131/17/2013First Reading Ways and Means
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20133/21/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/21/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments {785969/1 Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)53
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation52
3/27/20133/27/2013Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/4/20133/30/2013Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/5/20133/31/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)62
House4/5/20133/31/2013Returned Passed64
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.