HB0129

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judiciary Committee

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Establishing the Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to specified public officials on or before October 1, 2014; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0262
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0265 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Narrow Subject(s):Attorneys
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Legal Aid
Reports
Sunset
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/17/20131/17/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20133/20/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/21/20133/18/2013Favorable Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed51
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (103-28)53A
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.