HB0134

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore City - 46th District - Class B Location Restrictions - Limited Exemption

Sponsored by:

Delegate McHale

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


Synopsis:Authorizing the transfer within a specified area in the 46th Legislative District in Baltimore City of specified Class B alcoholic beverages licenses subject to specified restrictions under specified circumstances; and making stylistic changes.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates McHale, Hammen, and Clippinger
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0233
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Baltimore City
Churches -see also- Religion
Private Schools
Public Schools
Statutes:Article - Alcoholic Beverages
(9-204.1, 9-204.3)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/17/20131/17/2013First Reading Economic Matters
1/22/20131/22/2013Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20133/7/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/8/20133/8/2013Favorable Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed43
3/12/20133/12/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)45
Senate3/13/20133/13/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs44

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.