HB0135 (CH0385)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Montgomery County - Town of Kensington - Alcoholic Beverages - Special B-K Licenses MC 15-14

Sponsored by:

Montgomery County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385


Synopsis:Altering the description of commercial areas in the Town of Kensington in Montgomery County in which the Board of License Commissioners may issue special B-K alcoholic beverages licenses for use on the premises of restaurants located in those areas; prohibiting the holder of a specified license in a specified commercial area from serving alcoholic beverages after 11 p.m.; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Montgomery County Delegation
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0313
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Economic Matters   View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Restaurants
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:48 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/13/20141/13/2014First Reading Economic Matters
1/15/20141/15/2014Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20143/7/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/10/20143/7/2014Favorable with Amendments {943097/1 Report Adopted43A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43A
3/11/20143/8/2014Third Reading Passed (136-0)44
Senate3/12/20143/9/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs43
4/2/20144/2/2014Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/20143/25/2014Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/5/20143/27/2014Third Reading Passed (47-0)61
House4/5/20143/30/2014Returned Passed66
Post Passage5/5/20145/5/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:48 P.M.