HB0150

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Kara's Law)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kipke

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary


Synopsis:Requiring a police officer who detains a driver who was involved in a motor vehicle accident that resulted in the death of, or a life-threatening injury to another person, to require the driver to submit to specified drug and alcohol testing; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Kipke, Aumann, Beidle, Dwyer, Eckardt, Frick, Frush, George, Hough, Kach, Kaiser, Krebs, McComas, McDonough, A. Miller, W. Miller, Norman, Schuh, Sophocleus, and M. Washington
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Narrow Subject(s):Accidents
Alcoholic Beverages -see also- AB-By Subd; Subst Abuse; etc.
Arrests
Chemical Tests
Controlled Dangerous Substances -see also- Drugs; Subst Abus
Death -see also- Advance Medical Directives; Wrongful Death
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Motor Vehicle Operation
Statutes:Article - Transportation
(16-205.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20131/18/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/17/20131/17/2013Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
1/18/20131/18/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
2/11/20132/11/2013Unfavorable Report by Judiciary

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.