HB0152

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Procedure - Successive Federal and State Prosecutions - Bar

Sponsored by:

Delegate Anderson

Status:

In the House - Third Reading Failed (46-89)


Synopsis:Providing that a prosecution under a State criminal statute is barred if the defendant was previously prosecuted in a United States District Court for a crime arising out of the same incident, the elements of the crime are identical in the State and federal statutes, and the federal prosecution resulted in a conviction or an acquittal; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Anderson, Vallario, Carter, Cluster, Conaway, Dumais, Glenn, Hough, Ivey, McComas, McDermott, Mitchell, Parrott, Smigiel, and Valderrama
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Procedure
Narrow Subject(s):Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
District Courts
Federal Government
Jurisdiction
Trials
Statutes:Article - Criminal Procedure
(1-211)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20131/18/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/17/20131/17/2013Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments {962210/1 Report Adopted40
Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Cardin) Adopted 40
3/7/20133/7/2013Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 42
3/12/20133/12/2013Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 45
3/14/20133/14/2013Floor Committee Amendment {612114/1 Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20133/16/2013Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted49
Third Reading Failed (46-89)49

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.