HB0153

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional

Sponsored by:

Delegate Anderson

Status:

In the House - Conference Committee Appointed


Synopsis:Establishing that the representation provided by the Office of the Public Defender to an indigent individual at a bail hearing before a District Court or circuit court judge shall be limited solely to the bail hearing and shall terminate automatically at the conclusion of the hearing; and establishing a exception.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Anderson, Vallario, Clippinger, Cluster, Conaway, Dumais, Glenn, Hough, Ivey, McComas, McDermott, Mitchell, Parrott, Smigiel, and Valderrama
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Procedure
Narrow Subject(s):Bail
Circuit Courts
District Courts
Hearings
Indigent Persons
Legal Aid
Statutes:Article - Criminal Procedure
(16-204)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20131/18/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/21/20131/21/2013Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25/20132/25/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2/26/20132/26/2013Favorable with Amendments {282218/1 Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed with Amendments35
2/28/20132/28/2013Third Reading Passed ((116-18)37
Senate2/28/20132/28/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings35
3/22/20133/22/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments {688379/263
Special Order until later today (Senator Getty) Adopted 63
Favorable with Amendments {688379/263
Committee Amendment Adopted63
Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Frosh) Adopted 63
4/8/20134/2/2013Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/8/20134/3/2013Floor Amendment (Senator Frosh) {103225/1 Adopted65
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-12)65
House4/8/20134/3/2013House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments67
House Requests Senate Recede67
Conference Committee Appointed67
Delegates Vallario, Swain, and Smigiel67

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.