HB0159 (CH0122)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Permit MC 21-18

Sponsored by:

Montgomery County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122


Synopsis:Establishing a basket of cheer permit in Montgomery County; requiring the Board of License Commissioners to grant the permit at no cost to holders of certain Class C licenses; and providing that the permit authorizes the permit holder to provide as a prize at a benefit performance a basket of cheer, consisting of certain alcoholic beverages for off-premises consumption.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Montgomery County Delegation
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Awards, Medals and Prizes -see also- Gaming
Montgomery County
Statutes:Article - Alcoholic Beverages
(25-102, 25-1312)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2018 4:44 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/17/20181/17/2018First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/7/20183/7/2018Favorable Report Adopted41
Second Reading Passed41
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (134-0)42
Senate3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs43
3/15/20183/15/2018Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/20183/23/2018Favorable Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed54
3/28/20183/24/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)55
House3/29/20183/22/2018Returned Passed56
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 1:05 P.M.