HB0167 (CH0352)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Government - Commemorative Days - Maryland Emancipation Day

Sponsored by:

Delegate Ivey

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352


Synopsis:Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim November 1 as Maryland Emancipation Day.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Ivey, Afzali, Anderson, Aumann, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Bohanan, Branch, Braveboy, Bromwell, Burns, Cane, Cardin, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Elliott, Feldman, Frick, Frush, Gaines, George, Gilchrist, Glass, Glenn, Griffith, Guzzone, Hammen, Haynes, Healey, Hershey, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, James, Jameson, Jones, Kach, Kaiser, Kipke, Kramer, Krebs, Luedtke, McConkey, McDonough, A. Miller, Mitchell, Morhaim, Myers, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Norman, Oaks, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Ready, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Serafini, Smigiel, Stein, Stukes, Summers, Tarrant, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilson, Wood, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0042
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Narrow Subject(s):Governor
Historical Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
Statutes:Article - State Government
(13-411)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20131/18/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed50
3/21/20133/18/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)51
Senate3/22/20133/20/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs51
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.